AB449
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera, Kirkpatrick, Conklin, Smith, Goicoechea, Aizley, Anderson, Atkinson, Benitez-Thompson, Bobzien, Brooks, Bustamante Adams, Carlton, Carrillo, Daly, Diaz, Dondero Loop, Ellison, Flores, Frierson, Goedhart, Grady, Hambrick, Hammond, Hansen, Hardy, Hickey, Hogan, Horne, Kirner, Kite, Livermore, Mastroluca, Munford, Neal, Ohrenschall, Pierce, Segerblom, Sherwood, Stewart, Woodbury, Horsford, McGinness

Revises provisions relating to economic development. (BDR 18-726)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 507.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar 22, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Taxation     Mar 31, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     Apr 04, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes      
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 04, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Apr 06, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 12, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     May 06, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 10, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue     May 12, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 17, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Revenue     May 18, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 19, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned
  Assembly Taxation     May 24, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Jun 03, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Jun 05, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Jun 05, 2011     05:00 PM          Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 01, 2011   Yea 33,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 07, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 643     Amend. No. 977   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

May 30, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 643.) To printer.

May 31, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 01, 2011

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 977.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 977 concurred in.
  • To printer.

Jun 08, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 507.
  • Sections 2 to 8, inclusive, 23.7, 29.5, 30.3, 30.7, 31.5, 85, 87 to 92, inclusive, and 93 of this act effective June 17, 2011. Sections 1, 9 to 15, inclusive, 16, 18 to 22, inclusive, 23.3, 31.3, 46, and subsection 2 of section 86 of this act effective July 1, 2011. Sections 1.5, 15.5, 17, 17.5, 23, 24 to 29, inclusive, 30, 31, 31.7 to 45, inclusive, 47 to 84, inclusive, and subsection 1 of section 86 of this act effective July 1, 2012. Sections 9 and 46 of this act expire by limitation on June 30, 2012.