SB382
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske

Establishes provisions relating to early intervention services for infants and toddlers with disabilities. (BDR 40-630)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 04, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amendment proposed, failed

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)