AB453
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 25, 2011.
By: Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining

Requires a supplier of motor vehicle fuel to provide certain statements relating to the presence or possible presence of manganese in any motor vehicle fuel sold or distributed by the supplier. (BDR 51-689)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar 24, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr 07, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr 12, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Natural Resources     Jun 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Jun 06, 2011     12:15 AM          Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 33,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 234     Amend. No. 969   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Mar 28, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 234.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 30, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 9.) To Senate.

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 969.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
  • (No further action taken.)