SB385
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2011.
By: Government Affairs

Grants power to local governments to perform certain acts or duties which are not prohibited or limited by statute. (BDR 20-170)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 08, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 13, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 15, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 02, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 15,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 338   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 28, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 338.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 21, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)