SB386
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2011.
By: Revenue

Makes various changes concerning the taxation of certain tobacco products. (BDR 32-869)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue     Mar 25, 2011     11:08 AM          Minutes          
  Senate Revenue     Apr 05, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 25, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.

Mar 28, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)