SB387
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2011.
By: Transportation

Revises certain provisions governing off-highway vehicles. (BDR 43-211)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 177.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Apr 05, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 10, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     May 19, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 30,   Nay 12,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 326   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 28, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 25, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 326.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

Apr 27, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 20, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 177.
  • Effective May 31, 2011, for the purpose of adopting regulations. Effective July 1, 2012, or 30 days after the date on which the Department of Motor Vehicles publishes on its website a statement indicating that it has completed the preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act, whichever occurs first, for all other purposes. Expires by limitation on July 1, 2012, if the Interim Finance Committee has not issued a notice to the Department of Motor Vehicles pursuant to section 62.5 of chapter 504, Statutes of Nevada 2009, at page 3105, before that date.