SB390
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Revises provisions relating to the statewide voter registration list. (BDR 24-1117)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 189.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 05, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 12, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 17, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 488   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 29, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 488.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 189.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.