SB392
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Government Affairs

Creates the Nevada Advisory Committee on Intergovernmental Relations as a statutory committee. (BDR 19-169)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 08, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 11, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 02, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 16, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, not agendized
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 20, 2011     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, not agendized

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 22, 2011   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 29, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Read second time.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 21, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)