SB401
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment

Revises provisions relating to public works. (BDR 28-1142)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Apr 08, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Apr 15, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amendment proposed, failed   Do pass, failed

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment. To printer.

Mar 29, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)