SJR14
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Judiciary

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to create an intermediate appellate court. (BDR C-1013)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 26.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 04, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 07, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 10, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 14, 2011   Yea 16,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 13, 2011   Yea 32,   Nay 8,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 29, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 07, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 14, 2011

Apr 15, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 11, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 13, 2011

May 14, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 26.
  • Return to 2013 Session.