AB473
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Revises provisions governing elections. (BDR 24-1021)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 485.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 28, 2011     11:27 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 05, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 14, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 05, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 19, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 518     Amend. No. 836   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 518.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 30, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 836.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 836 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 485.
  • Effective June 17, 2011.