AB474
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Ways and Means

Creates the Sunset Subcommittee of the Legislative Commission to review certain boards and commissions. (BDR 18-889)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 28, 2011     11:10 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 07, 2011     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 14, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 14, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 29, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 16, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 18, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 26, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 31, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 04, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 411     Amend. No. 874   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Government Affairs and Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committees.

Apr 06, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From Concurrent Committee on Government Affairs: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 411.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Exemption effective.
  • Withdrawn from Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 26, 2011

Apr 27, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Jun 02, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 874.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .

Jun 04, 2011

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)