AB478
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Ways and Means

Revises the limitation on the principal amount of bonds and other securities that may be issued by the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada to finance certain projects. (BDR S-887)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 179.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 28, 2011     11:10 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 06, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 07, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 20, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 26, 2011   Yea 16,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 199   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 199.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

Apr 19, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

May 23, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 25, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 26, 2011

May 27, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 28, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 179.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.