AB479
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Ways and Means

Revises provisions governing the hours of operation of state offices and the hours of employment of state employees. (BDR 23-890)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 28, 2011     11:10 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 13, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Rescheduled
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 15, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Government Affairs and Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committees.

Apr 14, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From Concurrent Committee on Government Affairs: Without recommendation.
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)