AB483
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Ways and Means

Makes a supplemental appropriation to the State Distributive School Account for unanticipated shortfalls in Fiscal Year 2010-2011 in certain tax revenue. (BDR S-1225)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 117.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 28, 2011     11:10 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 27, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 03, 2011     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 09, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 20, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 16, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 25, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 574   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

May 13, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 574.) To printer.

May 14, 2011

May 16, 2011

May 18, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

May 20, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 23, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 25, 2011

May 26, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 117.
  • Effective May 26, 2011.