AB488
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Ways and Means

Delays prospective change in allocation of proceeds from certain room taxes. (BDR S-1180)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 28, 2011     11:10 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 27, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 03, 2011     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)