AB494
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Ways and Means

Makes appropriations to restore the balances in the Stale Claims Account, Emergency Account, Reserve for Statutory Contingency Account and Contingency Fund. (BDR S-1267)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 465.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 28, 2011     11:10 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 22, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 02, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Jun 06, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 04, 2011   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 897   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 04, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 897.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: None, Excused: 4.)
  • To printer.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs.
  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Chapter 465.
  • Effective June 16, 2011.