AB496
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Ways and Means

Makes a supplemental appropriation to the Budget and Planning Division of the Department of Administration for increased costs of the single audit. (BDR S-1176)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 28, 2011     11:10 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 06, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 29, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Indefinitely postponed

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)