AB500
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Ways and Means

Temporarily revises distribution of revenue from certain licensing fees for slot machines. (BDR 41-1165)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 220.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 28, 2011     11:10 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 20, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 30, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Revenue     May 17, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Rerefer
  Senate Finance     May 20, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 25, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 09, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 28, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

May 02, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 06, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 09, 2011

May 10, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To committee.

May 18, 2011

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Finance.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

May 26, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 27, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 28, 2011

May 29, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 31, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 220.
  • Effective July 1, 2011, and expires by limitation June 30, 2013.