AB236
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 12, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Daly, Carrillo, Healey

Makes changes to the rules of the road regarding motorcycles. (BDR 43-659)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 28, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 11, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     Apr 26, 2013     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     May 17, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2013   Yea 35,   Nay 4,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 24, 2013   Yea 5,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 319     Amend. No. 756   

Bill History

Mar 12, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 13, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 319.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2013

Apr 19, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 21, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 756.) To printer.

May 22, 2013

May 23, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2013

May 25, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)