AB465
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Ways and Means

Creates the General Services Division in the Department of Public Safety. (BDR 43-1150)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 388.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 25, 2013     11:31 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 15, 2013     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 06, 2013     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May 16, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 27, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Finance     May 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 09, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 29, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 27, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 01, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 05, 2013

  • Amended notice of eligibility: Exempt.

May 08, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2013

May 13, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

May 28, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 29, 2013

May 30, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 388.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.