SB123
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Atkinson, Bobzien, Kirkpatrick

Revises provisions relating to energy. (BDR 58-106)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 490.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 03, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 05, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 06, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 12, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and re-refer
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 06, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 09, 2013     12:25 PM          Minutes          Without recommendation, recommended to be re-referred
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 17, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 27, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Jun 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Jun 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 22, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 31,   Nay 10,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 576     Amend. No. 790   

Bill History

Feb 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 19, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 23, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 576.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

May 09, 2013

  • From committee: Without recommendation and re-refer to the Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 21, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 790.) To printer.

May 22, 2013

May 23, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

Jun 02, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 03, 2013

Jun 06, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 11, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 490.
  • Effective June 11, 2013.