SB180
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 21, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom, Spearman, Parks, Atkinson, Aizley, Healey, Ohrenschall, Elliot Anderson, Hogan, Neal, Pierce, Swank

Requires a court to award certain relief to an employee injured by certain unlawful employment practices under certain circumstances. (BDR 53-561)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 04, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 26, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 17, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 16, 2013   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 20, 2013   Yea 24,   Nay 14,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 21, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 22, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 15, 2013

  • Read second time.

Apr 16, 2013

Apr 17, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 17, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

May 21, 2013

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 24, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 30, 2013

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 31, 2013

  • Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)