SB442
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Education

Eliminates certain mandates relating to schools. (BDR 34-1078)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 379.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 08, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May 06, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     May 15, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May 27, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 24, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 200     Amend. No. 642   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 26, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 16, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 200.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2013

Apr 18, 2013

  • In Assembly.

Apr 22, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 21, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 642.) To printer.

May 22, 2013

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2013

May 27, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment No. 642 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Chapter 379.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.