SB443
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Education

Revises provisions governing charter schools. (BDR 34-1079)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 340.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 05, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Education     May 01, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Education     May 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     May 15, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 15, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 24, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 641   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 26, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 10, 2013

  • Read second time.

Apr 12, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2013

Apr 16, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 17, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 641.) To printer.

May 18, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2013

May 27, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 29, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment No. 641 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 31, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Chapter 340.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.