SB445
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Education

Establishes the Nevada Educational Choice Scholarship Program. (BDR 34-907)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Apr 09, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Apr 11, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation, recommended to be re-referred
  Senate Finance     May 13, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     May 30, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Mar 26, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2013

  • From committee: Without recommendation and re-refer to the Committee on Finance.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To committee.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)