SB447
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Education

Makes various changes relating to education. (BDR 34-197)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 342.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 01, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 12, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr 29, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 29, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 30, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 13, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 17, 2013     07:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     May 27, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 15, 2013   Yea 18,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 28, 2013   Yea 37,   Nay 3,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 460   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 26, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 460.)
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

May 13, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 15, 2013

May 16, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 27, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 28, 2013

May 29, 2013

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 31, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Chapter 342.
  • Sections 11.5 and 12 of this act effective June 1, 2013. Sections 1 to 11, inclusive, of this act effective on July 1, 2013.