SB451
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Health and Human Services

Directs the Legislative Committee on Child Welfare and Juvenile Justice to conduct an interim study concerning standards of care for specialized foster homes. (BDR S-1084)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 18, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 07, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 09, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 28, 2013     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2013   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 597   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 26, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2013

  • EXEMPT, Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule 14.6.4(a).

May 15, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 16, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 597.) To printer.

May 17, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

May 20, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections.
  • To committee.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)