SB455
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Education

Establishes a pilot program for school districts to establish or expand programs for children who are English language learners. (BDR S-1131)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 12, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation, recommended to be re-referred
  Senate Finance     Apr 25, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 17, 2013     07:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 27, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2013

  • From committee: Without recommendation.

Apr 16, 2013

  • Read second time.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To committee.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)