SB467
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Finance

Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-1130)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 448.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 05, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 12, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr 29, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 13, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 17, 2013     07:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     May 27, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Education     May 27, 2013     06:30 PM          Minutes          Reconsidered of previous action on: 5-27-13   Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 15, 2013   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 02, 2013   Yea 40,   Nay 1,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 461     Amend. No. 900   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 27, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 461.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

May 13, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 15, 2013

May 16, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 29, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 900.) To printer.

May 30, 2013

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 31, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 02, 2013

Jun 03, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 900 concurred in.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 448.
  • Effective June 10, 2013.