SB471
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Finance

Revises provisions relating to the Account for Charter Schools. (BDR 34-1133)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 05, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and re-refer
  Senate Finance     Apr 17, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 13, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 15, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 18, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 20, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 194   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 27, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 09, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.

Apr 10, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 194.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 11, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

May 16, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 17, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

May 21, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)