AJR8
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Education

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to provide for the appointment of a Student Regent to the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada. (BDR C-201)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 25, 2013     11:43 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Senate Education     Apr 01, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     Apr 08, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 13, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 27, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 10, 2013

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2013

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2013

  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)