AB459
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Education

Revises provisions relating to school property. (BDR 34-203)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 315.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 25, 2013     11:43 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     May 08, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     May 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 23, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 24, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 343     Amend. No. 544   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 27, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 16, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 343.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 22, 2013

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 544.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

Apr 24, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 15, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2013

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2013

May 27, 2013

  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2013

  • To enrollment.

May 31, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 315.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.