AB460
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Education

Revises provisions governing the statewide system of accountability for public schools. (BDR 34-195)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 365.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 25, 2013     11:43 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Education     Apr 05, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     May 08, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     May 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2013   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 24, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 515   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 28, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 515.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2013

Apr 23, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 15, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2013

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2013

May 27, 2013

  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2013

  • To enrollment.

May 31, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 365.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.