SB477
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Finance

Revises provisions relating to the basic support guarantee per pupil for school districts and the allocation of special education program units. (BDR 34-499)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr 08, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Apr 10, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 06, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Rescheduled
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 13, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 16, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 27, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 12, 2013

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2013

  • Read second time.

Apr 16, 2013

Apr 17, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 18, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)