SB481
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Finance

Extends the temporary waiver from certain minimum expenditure requirements for textbooks for school districts. (BDR S-1132)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 431.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar 23, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 13, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 17, 2013     07:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 23, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 28, 2013   Yea 15,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 02, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 851   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 27, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2013

  • Notice of exemption.

May 27, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 851.) To printer.

May 28, 2013

May 29, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 30, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 31, 2013

  • Read second time.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 02, 2013

Jun 03, 2013

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 07, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 431.
  • Effective June 7, 2013.