SB486
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Finance

Makes appropriations relating to education. (BDR S-1178)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 522.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr 15, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 19, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 24, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 02, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 941   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 27, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2013

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 01, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 941.) To printer.

Jun 02, 2013

Jun 03, 2013

Jun 06, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 12, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 522.
  • Effective June 12, 2013.