SB500
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Education

Creates the Task Force on K-12 Public Education Funding. (BDR S-1100)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 500.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     May 04, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 13, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 13, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     Jun 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Jun 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 01, 2013   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 908   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 27, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2013

  • Notice of exemption.

May 31, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 908.) To printer.

Jun 01, 2013

Jun 03, 2013

Jun 06, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 11, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 500.
  • Effective June 11, 2013, for the purpose of appointing members to the Task Force on K-12 Public Education Funding created by section 2 of this act and on July 1, 2013, for all other purposes. Expires by limitation on June 30, 2015.