SB58
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 20, 2012.
By: Education

Revises provisions relating to distance education. (BDR 34-396)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 321.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Feb 20, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Mar 06, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 13, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 15, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May 27, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2013   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 28, 2013   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 117   

Bill History

Dec 20, 2012

  • Prefiled. Recommended to be referred to the Committee on Education. To printer.

Dec 27, 2012

  • From printer.

Feb 04, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

Apr 02, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 03, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 117.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 04, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Notice of exemption.
  • To committee.

May 16, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 17, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

May 20, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education.
  • To committee.

May 27, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 28, 2013

May 29, 2013

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 31, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 321.
  • Effective June 1, 2013.