SB59
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 20, 2012.
By: Education

Eliminates a restriction on times during which a charter school may use school buildings owned by a school district. (BDR 34-397)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Mar 18, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 12, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 17, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 20, 2012

  • Prefiled. Recommended to be referred to the Committee on Education. To printer.

Dec 27, 2012

  • From printer.

Feb 04, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

Apr 15, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 16, 2013

  • Read second time.

Apr 17, 2013

Apr 18, 2013

  • In Assembly.

Apr 22, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 18, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)