AB79
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 01, 2013.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to early childhood education programs. (BDR 38-199)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 114.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb 27, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 29, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr 02, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 30, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 16, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 15, 2013   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 20, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 105   

Bill History

Feb 01, 2013

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
  • From printer.

Feb 04, 2013

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 06, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 09, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 105.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2013

Apr 12, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2013

Apr 16, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 17, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 18, 2013

  • Read second time.

May 20, 2013

May 21, 2013

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 24, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 114.
  • Effective May 24, 2013.