SB97
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 11, 2013.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to hearings concerning children who are removed from their homes. (BDR 38-69)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 66.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 19, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 19, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 03, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 15, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 04, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2013   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 58   

Bill History

Feb 11, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 12, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 02, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 03, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 58.) To printer.

Apr 04, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 16, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 17, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

May 20, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • To enrollment.

May 23, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

May 24, 2013

  • Chapter 66.
  • Effective October 1, 2013.