SB99
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 11, 2013.
By: Health and Human Services

Provides for the protection of children in the child welfare system from identity theft. (BDR 38-65)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 323.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 19, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 28, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 05, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 03, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 15, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 03, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2013   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 20     Amend. No. 666   

Bill History

Feb 11, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 12, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 27, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 01, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 02, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 20.) To printer.

Apr 03, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 21, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 666.) To printer.

May 22, 2013

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2013

May 24, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 28, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment No. 666 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 31, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 323.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.