SB102
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 11, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kieckhefer

Revises provisions relating to the Kenny C. Guinn Memorial Millennium Scholarship. (BDR 34-837)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 68.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Mar 06, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Mar 20, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     Apr 24, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     May 13, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 15, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2013   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 81   

Bill History

Feb 11, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 12, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 81.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2013

Apr 12, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2013

Apr 16, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 14, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 16, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

May 20, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • To enrollment.

May 23, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

May 24, 2013

  • Chapter 68.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.