AB93
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 11, 2013.
By: Health and Human Services

Makes various changes concerning investigations relating to child care facilities. (BDR 38-61)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 118.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 04, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 29, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 02, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 16, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 20, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 466   

Bill History

Feb 11, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 12, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 466.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2013

Apr 22, 2013

Apr 23, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 17, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 18, 2013

  • Read second time.

May 20, 2013

May 21, 2013

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 24, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 118.
  • Effective July 1, 2014.