SB109
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 12, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Settelmeyer, Gustavson, Cegavske, Goicoechea

Revises provisions relating to off-highway vehicles. (BDR 43-467)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 477.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Mar 08, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 05, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     May 09, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Transportation     May 14, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     Jun 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 16, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 21, 2013   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 163     Amend. No. 632   

Bill History

Feb 12, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 13, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 12, 2013

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 163.) To printer.

Apr 16, 2013

Apr 17, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 20, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 632.) To printer.

May 21, 2013

May 22, 2013

  • In Senate.

Jun 03, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment No. 632 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 11, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 477.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.