AB103
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carrillo, Fiore, Daly, Martin

Revises provisions relating to school police officers. (BDR 23-152)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 06, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 11, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 13, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 14, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 23, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)