SJR6
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2013.
By: Finance

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to create the Governor Guinn Millennium Scholarship Trust Fund. (BDR C-47)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 26, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes      
  Senate Finance     Mar 26, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Apr 10, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 13, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Feb 14, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)