AB126
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 14, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Flores, Aizley, Bobzien, Eisen, Healey, Jones, Woodhouse

Requires the disclosure of certain nutritional information in certain chain restaurants. (BDR 51-81)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 06, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 10, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 09, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 16, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2013   Yea 25,   Nay 14,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2013   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 295     Amend. No. 692   

Bill History

Feb 14, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 15, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 17, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 295.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2013

Apr 19, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 692.) To printer.

May 23, 2013

May 24, 2013

  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2013

  • Senate Amendment No. 692 concurred in.

May 29, 2013

  • To enrollment.

May 31, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2013

  • Vetoed by the Governor.