SB164
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks, Spearman, Woodhouse, Kihuen, Segerblom, Atkinson, Denis, Ford, Jones, Manendo, Roberson, Settelmeyer, Smith, Healey, Elliot Anderson, Bobzien, Spiegel, Aizley, Bustamante Adams, Horne

Revises provisions governing safe and respectful learning environments in public schools. (BDR 34-454)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 393.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Mar 20, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 05, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 04, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 20, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May 27, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 21, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 01, 2013   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 290     Amend. No. 899     Amend. No. 910   

Bill History

Feb 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 19, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 07, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 290.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

May 20, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

May 22, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 29, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 899.) To printer.

May 30, 2013

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 910.) To printer.

May 31, 2013

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 899 and 910 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 393.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.